Witryna1841 Ship Eutaw 10 March Ship Eutaw 7 July. 1842 SS Britannia 24 January Ship Saluda 13 June Brig Rebecca 16 June. 1843 Mozart 30 January. 1844 SS Rockall 22 February. 1845 ... The ship logo, which is still used in part, was designed and contributed by Pat Walker and Sheila Tate. WitrynaThe ship’s cook, Thomas Thompson, ‘a man of colour’, remained in SA. He was remanded before the SA Resident Magistrate’s court in Nov 1841 on suspicion of being an escaped convict from Sydney, and also of being a horse stealer. SHIP BENARES-7 passengers from Leith, Scotland and Pt Phillip 27/7/1841. GILKISON, Captain James …
Stichting Maritiem Historische Data - Schip
Witryna7 kwi 2024 · Glaucus and Scylla by J. M. W. Turner, 1841, from the Kimbell Art Museum, Fort Worth, Texas, via Sartle The earliest surviving text to mention Scylla is Homer’s Odyssey, in which she is depicted as a monster who kills six of Odysseus’ men as they attempt to make their way back to Ithaca. Later ancient writers then fleshed out the … WitrynaORESTES Ship, 529t, Smith; Bristol, 13/8/'39 - Syd, 27/11/'39, wi6th 239 migrants + Surgeon's journal *AJCP PRO reel 3214./-mainly Irish. ... Arrival of the ship Orestes from Liverpool 6th Jan 1841 to Sydney 15th May 1841 Vessel details Name Orestes Type ship Master Cook Cargo/other cargo: merchandise Passenger / crew list … gmail headquarters
Category:HMS Orestes (ship, 1824) - Wikimedia Commons
WitrynaHMS Orestes was a 16-gun brig-sloop of the Seagull class of the British Royal Navy, launched in October 1805.She served during the Napoleonic Wars, primarily in the … Witrynathe latter s inquiry Orestes informs him of the reason for his presence Racine s Andromaque at the Sorbonne Paris Update ... of Epirus Pylades feared that the storm which separated their ships near Epirus six months before had brought Orestes the death he had always ... 1841 also by Thomas Fry page images at Google Racine … Witryna- 12 November 1841: Commanded (until paying off at Portsmouth) by Commander Peter Sampson Hambly, South America: 20 August 1842 - November 1843: Commanded … bolsonaro 1920 1080